This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2022 at 00:06:05 (UTC).

NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY,, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE NIKI ALEXANDER FAMILY TRUST, ET AL. VS THOMAS BLOCK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY,, AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE NIKI ALEXANDER FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THOMAS BLOCK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5079

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHETTY NIKI ALEXANDER AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE NIKI ALEXANDER FAMILY TRUST

ZAHARESCU ADINA

Defendants

BLOCK THOMAS

EMREK JACK HUSBAND AND WIFE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE EMREK FAMILY TRUST

EMREK SUE HUSBAND AND WIFE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE EMREK FAMILY TRUST

NEW HAVEN FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORAITON

S.B.S. TRUST DEED NETWORK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/15/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/15/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

2/15/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/15/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY, FOR...)

2/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY, FOR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY, FOR...)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY, FOR...)

Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE FOR TRO AND SETTING OSC RE P.I.

2/17/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE FOR TRO AND SETTING OSC RE P.I.

Brief - BRIEF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/24/2022: Brief - BRIEF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NIKI-ALEXANDER SHETTY ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/24/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NIKI-ALEXANDER SHETTY ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADINA ZAHARESCU ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/24/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADINA ZAHARESCU ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Complaint

2/9/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketBrief (Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Niki-Alexander Shetty ISO Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Adina Zaharescu ISO Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR TRO AND SETTING OF AN OSC RE P.I.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketOrder (granting ex parte for TRO and setting OSC re P.I.); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY, FOR...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause rePreliminary Injunction) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty,, an individual and as trustee of the Niki Alexander Family Trust (Plaintiff); Adina Zaharescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW HAVEN FINANCIAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where S.B.S. TRUST DEED NETWORK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK