Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 06:46:53 (UTC).

NIGEL GROOM VS SIERRA HOUSE, L.P., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 NIGEL GROOM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIERRA HOUSE, L P , A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2931

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROOM NIGEL

Defendants

HASSID YORAM DBA SIERRA HOUSE APARTMENTS

SIERRA HOUSE L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DEAR HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAWABATA BLAKE MAKOA

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/25/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/26/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nigel Groom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIERRA HOUSE L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT