This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 04:21:45 (UTC).

NIDEC MOTOR CORPORATION VS CONSOLIDATED ELEVATOR COMPANY, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 NIDEC MOTOR CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONSOLIDATED ELEVATOR COMPANY, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS C. FALLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0505

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS C. FALLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIDEC MOTOR CORPORATION DBA CANTON ELEVATOR

Defendant

CONSOLIDATED ELEVATOR COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

Defendant Attorney

SCHELL TROY ALLYN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

12/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

12/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

12/6/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

11/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Proof of Service by Mail

11/16/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

10/4/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

9/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

9/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

9/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department G - Hon. Salvatore Sirnaeffective 12/09/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 01/19/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department A to Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department R Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nidec Motor Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Consolidated Elevator Company, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED ELEVATOR CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NIDEC MOTOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO