This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 19:57:46 (UTC).

NIDE, LP VS MINOO MEIRI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 NIDE, LP filed an Other lawsuit against MINOO MEIRI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0771

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIDE LP

Defendants

MEIRI MINOO

MEIRI SHLOMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

Defendant Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

9/2/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/3/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD W. BETTY RE: UNILATERAL TRIAL DOCUMENTS

8/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD W. BETTY RE: UNILATERAL TRIAL DOCUMENTS

Exhibit List

8/13/2021: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/18/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR TRIAL)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR TRIAL)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

6/2/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

Proof of Personal Service

5/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MINOO MEIRI)

4/29/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MINOO MEIRI)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SHLOMO MEIRI)

4/29/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SHLOMO MEIRI)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Advance Plaintiff's Motion to Compel to the Present) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Plaintiff's Motion...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Advance Plaintiff's Motion to Compel to the Present) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Nide, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Advance Plaintiff's Motion to Compel to the Present); Filed by Nide, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((SHLOMO MEIRI)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((MINOO MEIRI)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nide, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nide, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Nide, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nide, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A