This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2022 at 09:27:15 (UTC).

NICOLE VASQUEZ VS ALEJANDRO ALCALA, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 NICOLE VASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEJANDRO ALCALA, JR ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6934

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ NICOLE

Defendants

ALCALA JR. ALEJANDRO

ALCALA LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTPHAL WESLEY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/19/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/19/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2024
  • Hearing08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2024
  • Hearing02/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nicole Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Alcala, Jr. (Defendant); Lynn Alcala (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nicole Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Alcala, Jr. (Defendant); Lynn Alcala (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nicole Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Alcala, Jr. (Defendant); Lynn Alcala (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTPHAL WESLEY