Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 20:22:26 (UTC).

NICOLE ROSS VS 6938 LAUREL CANYON, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 NICOLE ROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 6938 LAUREL CANYON, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1940

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROSS NICOLE

HUNT KIMBERLY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

6938 LAUREL CANYON LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COHEN GIDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH CRAIG R.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/11/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

1/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

11/19/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/30/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2023
  • Hearing10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Hearing04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Hearing04/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by 6938 LAUREL CANYON, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 6938 LAUREL CANYON, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant); GIDI COHEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nicole Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION); Filed by 6938 LAUREL CANYON, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant); GIDI COHEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nicole Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nicole Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nicole Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nicole Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH CRAIG RICHARD