Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 17:01:33 (UTC).

NICOLE GILLEY VS LESLIE ENLOE

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 NICOLE GILLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LESLIE ENLOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2832

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILLEY NICOLE

Defendants

ENLOE LESLIE

ENLOE STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAIR MATTHEW P

Defendant Attorney

KIM STEVE

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/12/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

11/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

12/9/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Demand for Jury Trial

12/17/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/17/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/18/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Leslie Enloe (Defendant); Stephen Enloe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Leslie Enloe (Defendant); Stephen Enloe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nicole Gilley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM STEVE