This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2023 at 05:59:33 (UTC).

NICOLE FIZOR VS HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 NICOLE FIZOR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6824

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIZOR NICOLE

Defendants

NIEMANN MATTHEW

HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COATE CHARLES M.

Defendant Attorney

BUCK CORRIE J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER C. TERRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HLFAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTIONS 2030.290, 2031.300, AND

2/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER C. TERRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HLFAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTIONS 2030.290, 2031.300, AND

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/15/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER DEFENDANT HLFAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTIONS 2030.290, 2031.300, AND 2033.280

2/15/2023: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER DEFENDANT HLFAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTIONS 2030.290, 2031.300, AND 2033.280

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/15/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Ruling

1/25/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE TH...)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE TH...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZORS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS TO RESPOND

1/23/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZORS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS TO RESPOND

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHARLES M. COATE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZORS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN LOKEY FI

1/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHARLES M. COATE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZORS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN LOKEY FI

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF CHARLES M. COATE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZORS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN

1/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF CHARLES M. COATE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZORS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE TH...)

1/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE TH...)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL RE PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZOR'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS

1/19/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL RE PLAINTIFF NICOLE FIZOR'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTIONS TO COMPEL HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

1/19/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTION TO COMPEL

1/19/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE THE HEARINGS ON HER MOTION TO COMPEL

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDERS COMPELLING DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF D

1/10/2023: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDERS COMPELLING DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF D

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDERS COMPELLING DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SETS OF FORM INTERROG

1/10/2023: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDERS COMPELLING DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SETS OF FORM INTERROG

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED THE TRUTH OF ALL MATTERS AND THE GENUINENESS OF ALL DOCUMENTS REQUESTED IN PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS

1/10/2023: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED THE TRUTH OF ALL MATTERS AND THE GENUINENESS OF ALL DOCUMENTS REQUESTED IN PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS

Notice of Ruling

12/19/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2024
  • Hearing01/04/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Hearing05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff?s Motion to Compel Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff?s Requests for Production of Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Hearing05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff?s Motion to Compel/Motion for an Order Deeming Admitted all Documents Requested in Plaintiff?s Request for Admission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Hearing05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff?s Motion to Compel Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff?s Form Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Order relief of waiver of objections related to Plaintiff?s Discovery Requests Set One

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Ruling RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE HEARINGS: Name Extension: RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE AND ADVANCE HEARINGS ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisor, Inc.'s MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS Pursuant to CCP Section 2030.290, 2031.300, And 2033.280 -[Hrg: 05/03/2023; Res ID: 433641366695]: Exact Name: Defendant Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisor, Inc.'s MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS Pursuant to CCP Section 2030.290, 2031.300, And 2033.280 -[Hrg: 05/03/2023; Res ID: 433641366695] ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Jennifer C. Terry in Support of Defendant HLFAs Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from Waiver of Discovery Objections Pursuant to CCP Sections 2030.290, 2031.300, and 2033.280 -[Hrg: 05/03/2023; Res ID: 433641366695]: Name Extension changed from of Jennifer C. Terry in Support of Defendant HLFAs Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from Waiver of Discovery Objections Pursuant to CCP Sections 2030.290, 2031.300, and 2033.280 to of Jennifer C. Terry in Support of Defendant HLFAs Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from Waiver of Discovery Objections Pursuant to CCP Sections 2030.290, 2031.300, and 2033.280 -[Hrg: 05/03/2023; Res ID: 433641366695] ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAddress for Charles M. Coate (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yolanda Orozco in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NICOLE FIZOR (Plaintiff); As to: HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MATTHEW NIEMANN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NICOLE FIZOR (Plaintiff); As to: HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MATTHEW NIEMANN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NICOLE FIZOR (Plaintiff); As to: HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MATTHEW NIEMANN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less