Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 22:23:39 (UTC).

NICOLE BEZIC VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 NICOLE BEZIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEZIC NICOLE

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL VALERIE G

Defendant Attorney

MAKINDE HANNAH J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/27/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NICOLE BEZIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NICOLE BEZIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NICOLE BEZIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NICOLE BEZIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAKINDE HANNAH J.