This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2022 at 07:35:40 (UTC).

NICHOLSON, JENNIFER VS WANSELL, SARA

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 NICHOLSON, JENNIFER filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against WANSELL, SARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREESON ALVAREZ, BRIGIT and COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5828

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREESON ALVAREZ, BRIGIT

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NICHOLSON JENNIFER

Respondent

WANSELL SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LONG HELEN GRAYCE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

9/9/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) - Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) (Petitions)

9/9/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) - Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) (Petitions)

Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders)

9/9/2022: Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/9/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Notice OF COURT HEARING (Comment)

9/9/2022: Notice - Notice OF COURT HEARING (Comment)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations)

9/9/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/9/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Minute Order

10/4/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/4/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

10/27/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Greeson Alvarez, Brigit, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence) (Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE