Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:22:56 (UTC).

NICHOLAS HENRY VS OSCAR CALDERON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 NICHOLAS HENRY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR CALDERON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3383

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY NICHOLAS

Defendants

CALDERON OSCAR

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LE VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nicholas Henry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nicholas Henry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nicholas Henry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant