This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 09:10:09 (UTC).

NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE VS CASDEN PARK LA BREA CONSTRUCTION INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CASDEN PARK LA BREA CONSTRUCTION INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6572

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICE NICHOLAS ALEXANDER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CASDEN PARK LA BREA QRS INC.

CASDEN PARK LA BREA CONSTRUCTION INC.

LA PARK LA BREA B LLC

LA PARK LA BREA C LLC

CASDEN ALAN I

CASDEN PARK LA BREA MANAGER A INC.

AIMCO-GP INC.

CASDEN PARK LA BREA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

CASDEN PROPERTIES L.P.

AIMCO PARK LA BREA HOLDINGS LLC

LA PARK LA BREA A LLC

CASDEN PARK LA BREA MANAGER LLC

CASDEN INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

AIMCO PARK LA BREA SERVICES LLC

CASDEN OFFICE PROPERTIES LLC

LA PARK LA BREA LLC

AIMCO PROPERTIES L.P.

Cross Defendant

TWENTY-FOUR/SEVEN COMMERCIAL CLEANING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAZMA ANDREW A.

Defendant Attorney

DELIS JOHN A

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

11/5/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

11/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES {\PAR}

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES {\PAR}

PI General Order

5/25/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LA PARK LA BREA C LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by LA PARK LA BREA C LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA PARK LA BREA C LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates {\par}); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NICHOLAS ALEXANDER RICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIMCO PARK LA BREA SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CASDEN PARK LA BREA A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Casden Property Company LLC is a litigant