This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 01:39:17 (UTC).

NICHOLAS ALBERT MEDA VS SMITHSON ELECTRIC, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 NICHOLAS ALBERT MEDA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SMITHSON ELECTRIC, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9890

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDA NICHOLAS ALBERT

Defendants

SMITHSON ELECTRIC INC.

SMITHSON THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIMENTEL GABRIEL J

Defendant Attorney

BRODSKY BARRY ZITRON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

10/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CAROL LYNN COX #5128

10/12/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CAROL LYNN COX #5128

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED RE DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS (TO CORRECT FUTURE COURT DATE)

10/13/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED RE DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS (TO CORRECT FUTURE COURT DATE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/20/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/4/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK THOMAS SMITHSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK THOMAS SMITHSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK THOMAS SMITHSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK THOMAS SMITHSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. PETERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. PETERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Motion to Compel Arbitration

9/8/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

9/8/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. PETERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. PETERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

6/29/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

7/2/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Report - JOINT REPORT RE AUGUST 12, 2021 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

8/10/2021: Status Conference Report - JOINT REPORT RE AUGUST 12, 2021 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION

4/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Amended Re Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (to Correct Future Court Date)); Filed by Smithson Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas Smithson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (and Stay Proceedings) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re: Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings); Filed by Smithson Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas Smithson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Carol Lynn Cox #5128); Filed by Smithson Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas Smithson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketReply (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Smithson Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas Smithson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOpposition (To Petition to Compel Arbitration, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities); Filed by Nicholas Albert Meda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Smithson Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas Smithson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Brian D. Peters in Support of Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings); Filed by Smithson Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas Smithson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Nicholas Albert Meda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Nicholas Albert Meda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Code...) of 03/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Code...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Nicholas Albert Meda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nicholas Albert Meda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nicholas Albert Meda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITHSON ELECTRIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODSKY BARRY ZITRON