This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 00:28:01 (UTC).

NICANOR COLIN ET AL VS WEST H&A LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 NICANOR COLIN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against WEST H A LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2173

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLIN GEMMA

COLIN NICANOR

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WEST H&A LLC

HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

SPENCER DOE 1 LAST NAME UNKNOWN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA TONY ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

RICHTER STUART M. ESQ.

ZAMORA IVETTE

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER&WEISS LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

DEFENDANT HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/26/2018: DEFENDANT HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENTS

3/7/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENTS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

Unknown

7/30/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/3/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

8/16/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Proof of Service

8/16/2018: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/20/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOrder (Notice of OSC re Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 42, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (default judgment on cross-complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (default judgment on cross-complaint) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Nicanor Colin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: default judgment on cross-complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Notice of OSC re Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nicanor Colin (Plaintiff); Gemma Colin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nicanor Colin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORB 1. VIOLATION OF CA. CIV CODE 2924.9 & 2923.55; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nicanor Colin (Plaintiff); Gemma Colin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

CDLG, PC, Tony Cara, Esq., 2973 Harbor Boulevard, Suite 594, Costa Mesa, CA 92626-3912, Phone: (888) 615-6765

CDLG, PC Tony Cara, Esq., SBN 170720

Peter Nisson, Esq, SBN 62276 or C OEEEQMONM

2973 Harbor Boulevard, Suite 594 sup(e:l;‘umy of Los Angeles Costa Mesa, CA 92626-3912 g Phone: (888) 615-6765 ~ FER 01 200

Fax: (888) 660-8874 +cuve OffiserClrkof Court

E-mail: cdlglawyer@gmail.com Sherri R Gprjen & , Deputy By_ Glicrietta Robinson

Attorney for Plaintiff(s), Nicanor and Gemma Colin

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

NICANOR COLIN AND GEMMA COLIN, | _ CASE NO.: 80 592 1.1 3 — COMPLAINT FOR?® .

Plaintiff(s),

1. VIOLATION OF CA. CIV CODE § 29249 & 2923.55;

VIOLATION OF CA. CIV. CODE § 2923.7, VIOLATION OF CA. CIV. CODE § 2923.6; VIOLATION OF CA. CIV. CODE § 2924.10 NEGLIGENCE; and

VIOLATION OF B&P CODE §17200 FRAUD

WEST H&A, LLC; WELLS FARGO BANK NA; HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ; SPENCER DOE 1, (last name unknown) and DOES 2-10, inclusive,

NOUnh LD

Defendants.

COMES NOW, Nicanor and Gemma Colin (hereinafter “Plaintiffs”) by and through their counsel file this Complaint and hereby allege as follows:

PARTIES

1. Plaintiffs, Nicanor and Gemma Colin collectively referred to as (“Plaintiffs”), were at all relevant times mentioned herein, residents of the County of Los Angeles in the City of

Palmdale, California residing at: 38938 Foxholm Drive, Palmdale 93551-3907 (“subject

Complaint

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST H&A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Mortgage Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart M Richter