This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 05:11:47 (UTC).

NGUYEN, JENNIFER THUY VS PEREZ, WILLIAM LEONARD

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 NGUYEN, JENNIFER THUY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PEREZ, WILLIAM LEONARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0930

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NGUYEN JENNIFER THUY

Respondent

PEREZ WILLIAM LEONARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/20/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Service

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

9/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

9/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • Hearing11/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less