This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 05:06:52 (UTC).

NGUYEN, THI HONG YEN - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 NGUYEN, THI HONG YEN - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3209

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VO HANG TRAN HONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAN QUANG VAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/24/2021: Minute Order

Withdrawal of Petition - Before First Hearing

5/6/2021: Withdrawal of Petition - Before First Hearing

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

4/5/2021: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

4/5/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Consent - Consent

4/5/2021: Consent - Consent

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPetition Denied (The Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on 4/5/2021 by Petitioner(s) Hang Tran Hong Vo i )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketWithdrawal of Petition - Before First Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketConsent (Consent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN QUANG VAN