This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2020 at 23:10:15 (UTC).

NGROUP, INC. VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 NGROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0137

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGROUP INC.

Defendant

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEARDSLEY AUSTIN T.

Defendant Attorney

BENDER RON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/3/2018: Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/3/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/27/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

4/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT- COURT JUDGMENT

4/5/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT- COURT JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AUSTIN BEARDSLEY ISO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AUSTIN BEARDSLEY ISO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/27/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE

9/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Filing of Petition for Relief Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code); Filed by West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 04/05/2019 entered for Plaintiff NGroup, Inc. against Defendant West Coast Distribution, Inc. .); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Default Judgment by Court); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Austin Beardsley ISO Request for Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketBrief (Brief Summary of the Case ISO Request for Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NGroup, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION is a litigant

Latest cases where NGROUP INC A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENDER RON ESQ.