Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 18:38:46 (UTC).

NGIN, RICHARD S VS RAY, LEAKHENA M

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 NGIN, RICHARD S filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAY, LEAKHENA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0309

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NGIN RICHARD S

Respondent

RAY LEAKHENA M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail - amended

6/11/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - amended

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/19/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

4/19/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

4/19/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Separate Property

4/19/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Proof of Service - Mail - FL-120, FL-105, FL-140, FL-150, FL-160, FL-311

4/19/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - FL-120, FL-105, FL-140, FL-150, FL-160, FL-311

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/19/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/19/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/19/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/15/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/15/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/15/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/15/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

3/15/2021: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

3/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/15/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (amended ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (FL-120, FL-105, FL-140, FL-150, FL-160, FL-311 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less