This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 12:28:12 (UTC).

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC. VS NAREK AVETYAN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against NAREK AVETYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0248

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC.

Defendant

AVETYAN NAREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIMACK MICHAEL I.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE]

6/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE]

Notice - NOTICE FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

6/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Judgment - JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE

6/29/2022: Judgment - JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST

6/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

6/29/2022: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Judgment Based on Sister-State]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice (for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment); Filed by Nextgear Capital, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nextgear Capital, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketJudgment (Based on Sister-State); Filed by Nextgear Capital, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by Nextgear Capital, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Re Accrued Interest); Filed by Nextgear Capital, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextgear Capital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRIMACK MICHAEL I.