This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 07:00:23 (UTC).

NEWTON, JOSHUA C VS NEWTON, BETH L

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 NEWTON, JOSHUA C filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NEWTON, BETH L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4176

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEWTON JOSHUA C

Respondent

NEWTON BETH L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOLDBERG ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less