This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 02:06:21 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS NARINE HOVHANNYSIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NARINE HOVHANNYSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0306

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

NEWREZ LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

SHARON J. POLAK TRUSTEE OF THE SURVIVORS REVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT CREATED UNDER THE POLAK TRUST AGREEMENT

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

CAPE LEGACY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE TO THE PROPERTY

COCHRAN KIMBERLY

NATIONWIDE TITLE CLEARING

HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A.; GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HOVHANNYSIAN NARINE

EDWARD W. STOLKER SR. TRUSTEE FOR THE EDWARD W. STOLKER SR. TUST

BLACKSTONE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GCFS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A.

STOLKER RICHARD S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACKMAN MARK

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

COX SETH PHILIP

KHOJAYAN VAHE VAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

9/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT S...) OF 08/10/2021

8/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT S...) OF 08/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT S...)

8/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT S...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT SHARON J. POLAK, TRUSTEE OF THE SURVIVORS REVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT CREATED UNDER THE POLAK TRUST A

8/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT SHARON J. POLAK, TRUSTEE OF THE SURVIVORS REVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT CREATED UNDER THE POLAK TRUST A

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

8/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/7/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

6/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Proof of Service by Mail

6/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Cross-Complaint

6/9/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CAPE LEGACY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Sharon J. Polak, Trustee Of The Survivors Revocable Trust Agreement Created Under The Polak Trust Agreement Dated October 18, 1995 As To An Undivided 50 Percent Interest (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CAPE LEGACY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NEWREZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKSTONE L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPE LEGACY INC. AN FTB SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC BANK NEVADA NATIONAL ASSN is a litigant