This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 04:52:08 (UTC).

NEWMARK MERRILL COMPANIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY, ET AL. VS CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER ARP19021

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 NEWMARK MERRILL COMPANIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER ARP19021. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9581

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEARL WHITTTIER PAINTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHANE TOWER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UPSIDE CIP LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

THOUSAND OAKS MARKETPLACE LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

NORWALK FLALLON LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEWMARK MERRILL MOUNTAIN STATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NMC GROVE ONTARIO LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEWMARK UNIVERSITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEWMARK MERRILL COMPANIES INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

GMX MELROSE LLC AN ILLINOIS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NMC GROVE ONTARIO EPL A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BRISTOL CHINO II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GINSBORG BOYS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NMC MELROSE PARK MANAGER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHOKRAOLAH LEVIAN NORWALK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EAST ANAHEIM ACQUISITION LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NMC WHITTIER II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NMC SANTA ANA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NORWALK TOWN SQUARE MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

80 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIDART MICHAEL J

Other Attorneys

BIDART MICHAEL J.

FAIR JASON ROBERT

KLEE PETER HANS

FELDMAN MARC JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO...) OF 09/13/2021

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO...) OF 09/13/2021

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

9/13/2021: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREA S. WARREN IN SUPPORT OF COLONY'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREA S. WARREN IN SUPPORT OF COLONY'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RE JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FO...)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RE JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FO...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER

7/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/27/2021

Order - ORDER ON JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PARTIES' OPENING AND RESPONDING MEMORANDA CONCERNING DEF'S FORTHCOMING DEMURRER

4/26/2021: Order - ORDER ON JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PARTIES' OPENING AND RESPONDING MEMORANDA CONCERNING DEF'S FORTHCOMING DEMURRER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PA...) OF 04/26/2021

4/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PA...) OF 04/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PA...)

4/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PA...)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/18/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application - APPLICATION JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PARTIES OPENING AND RESPONDING MEMORANDA CONCERNING DEFENDANTS FORTHCOMING DEMURRER PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1113(

3/26/2021: Application - APPLICATION JOINT APPLICATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT FOR PARTIES OPENING AND RESPONDING MEMORANDA CONCERNING DEFENDANTS FORTHCOMING DEMURRER PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1113(

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/18/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Hearing10/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Hearing10/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:01 PM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Rescheduling Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro...) of 09/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER ARP19021 (Defendant); IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DOE 8) (Defendant); NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DOE 1) (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Andrea S. Warren in Support of Colony's Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint); Filed by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY (DOE 13) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER ARP19021 (Defendant); IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DOE 8) (Defendant); NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (DOE 1) (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint); Filed by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY (DOE 13) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 11:39 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Newmark Merrill Companies Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Newmark Merrill Companies Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Newmark Merrill Companies Inc. (Plaintiff); NMC South (Plaintiff); Newmark Merrill Mountain States, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Newmark Merrill Companies Inc. (Plaintiff); NMC South (Plaintiff); Newmark Merrill Mountain States, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHOKRAOLAH LEVIAN NORWALK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UPSIDE CIP LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWMARK MERRILL COMPANIES INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NORWALK FLALLON LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant