This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2023 at 13:50:30 (UTC).

NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE, CURTIS A. KIN and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0352

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

CURTIS A. KIN

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS LLC

JONATHAN BENABOU AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE MANI BENABOU

Defendants

ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF THE ULA AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDER'S OFFICE

Not Classified By Court

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COSTELL JEFFREY LEE

MDDUFFIE SARA M.

Defendant Attorneys

SIEGEL KEVIN D.

CHU MORGAN

LOOPER JARED R

COLLETTI NICHOLAS RYAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DOUGHERTY LAURA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

4/3/2023: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Case Management Statement

4/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/15/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS R COLLETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDERS OFFICES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

3/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS R COLLETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDERS OFFICES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2023

Notice of Related Case

3/9/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer

3/9/2023: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/9/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Publication

3/8/2023: Proof of Publication

Answer

2/21/2023: Answer

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING FORM OF AND PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

2/15/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING FORM OF AND PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/15/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING FORM OF A...)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING FORM OF A...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING FORM OF A...) OF 02/08/2023

2/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING FORM OF A...) OF 02/08/2023

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING FORM OF AND PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF JOHN M. HAYTOL IN SUPPO

2/6/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING FORM OF AND PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF JOHN M. HAYTOL IN SUPPO

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV39662, and 23STCV00352 consolidated; case number 22STCV39662 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDER'S OFFICE (Defendant), ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER of the ULA and all proceedings related thereto (Defendant), CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant), COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant) to County of Los Angeles (Defendant), City of Los Angeles (Defendant), ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER of the ULA and all proceedings related thereto (Defendant), County of Los Angeles Recorder's Office (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Recorder's Office (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF NICHOLAS R COLLETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDERS OFFICES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Recorder's Office (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC, a California limited liability company to NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- JONATHAN BENABOU (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from JONATHAN BENABOU, as Trustee on behalf of THE MANI BENABOU FAMILY TRUST to JONATHAN BENABOU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); JONATHAN BENABOU, as Trustee on behalf of THE MANI BENABOU FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDER'S OFFICE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); JONATHAN BENABOU, as Trustee on behalf of THE MANI BENABOU FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDER'S OFFICE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); JONATHAN BENABOU, as Trustee on behalf of THE MANI BENABOU FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RECORDER'S OFFICE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less