This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2022 at 00:16:49 (UTC).

NEW YORK MARINE & GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS LJ PROPERTIES INC.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 NEW YORK MARINE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LJ PROPERTIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0910

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW YORK MARINE & GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LJ PROPERTIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERBER BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

SHAHAM YARON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Substitution of Attorney

7/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

7/21/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company on 06/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: New York Marine & General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAddress for Yaron Shaham (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant); As to: New York Marine & General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: New York Marine & General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/25/2021; Service Cost: 87.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: New York Marine & General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: New York Marine & General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: New York Marine & General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: LJ Properties Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LJ PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW YORK MARINE AND GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ADMINISTERED BY LWP CLAIMS SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant