This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 08:45:13 (UTC).

NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE VS HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF WILFRID F. NEWLAND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF WILFRID F NEWLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0164

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF WILFRID F. NEWLAND

ASO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE NANCY L.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

8/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

8/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Stipulation for Judgment

9/10/2020: Stipulation for Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT CANCELLING INSTRUMENT

9/10/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT CANCELLING INSTRUMENT

Proof of Service by Mail

9/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/14/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Proof of Personal Service

5/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

6/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/11/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/7/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/1/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/3/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/5/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Proposed Judgment Cancelling Instrument); Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASO L.L.C. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ELMAS PIRKOWITSCH is a litigant