This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2022 at 02:13:04 (UTC).

NETA SOROUDI VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 NETA SOROUDI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2779

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOROUDI NETA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAGHIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/15/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Motion

4/18/2022: Notice of Motion

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/18/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Reply - REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND APPOINTMENT OF A NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

5/20/2022: Reply - REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND APPOINTMENT OF A NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO CLAIMANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND APPOINTMENT OF A NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBITS; AND DECLARATION OF

5/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO CLAIMANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND APPOINTMENT OF A NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBITS; AND DECLARATION OF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT O...)

5/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT O...) OF 05/27/2022

5/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT O...) OF 05/27/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2025
  • Hearing04/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration for Appointment of a Neutral Arbitrator: Filed By: Neta Soroudi (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration for Appointment of a Neutral Arbitrator: Name Extension: for Appointment of a Neutral Arbitrator; Exact Name: blank; As To Parties changed from GEICO General Insurance Company (Defendant) to GEICO General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Appointment o...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Appointment o...) of 05/27/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 05/27/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketReply to Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for an Order Compelling Arbitration and Appointment of a Neutral Arbitrator; Filed by: Neta Soroudi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOpposition OPPOSITION TO CLAIMANTS PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND APPOINTMENT OF A NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBITS; AND DECLARATION OF ALEXIS CARANIKAS; Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Neta Soroudi (Plaintiff); As to: GEICO General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Neta Soroudi (Plaintiff); As to: GEICO General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAGHIAN EDWIN