This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 03:20:32 (UTC).

NEOMI HERNANDEZ-TORRES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FR. CHARLES J. RAMIREZ; AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 NEOMI HERNANDEZ-TORRES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FR CHARLES J RAMIREZ AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2854

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ-TORRES AN INDIVIDUAL NEOMI

Defendants

OUR LADY OF THE ASSUMPTION CHURCH; A NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION

RAMIREZ; AN INDIVIDUAL FR. CHARLES J.

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; A CORPORATION SOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLEKHIAN RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/13/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/16/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • Hearing05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • Hearing05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NEOMI HERNANDEZ-TORRES, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; a Corporation Sole (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 146.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NEOMI HERNANDEZ-TORRES, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: FR. CHARLES J. RAMIREZ; an individual (Defendant); OUR LADY OF THE ASSUMPTION CHURCH; a non-profit organization (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; a Corporation Sole (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NEOMI HERNANDEZ-TORRES, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: FR. CHARLES J. RAMIREZ; an individual (Defendant); OUR LADY OF THE ASSUMPTION CHURCH; a non-profit organization (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; a Corporation Sole (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NEOMI HERNANDEZ-TORRES, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: FR. CHARLES J. RAMIREZ; an individual (Defendant); OUR LADY OF THE ASSUMPTION CHURCH; a non-profit organization (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; a Corporation Sole (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less