This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 02:46:15 (UTC).

NENSI MOVSISYAN VS FCA US, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 NENSI MOVSISYAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0380

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOVSISYAN NENSI

Defendants

FCA US LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

SKANES MARK W.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/24/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/27/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/7/2023: Answer

Answer

4/7/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Date: 03/08/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nensi Movsisyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less