This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 11:08:26 (UTC).

NELSON, VALERINE LU - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 NELSON, VALERINE LU - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NORD, SCOTT J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0224

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NORD, SCOTT J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HATTON MARA

Decedent

NELSON VALERINE LU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'TOOLE BRIAN A

 

Court Documents

Waiver - (No Fee) - of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary - Attachment 3d

7/11/2017: Waiver - (No Fee) - of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary - Attachment 3d

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

7/11/2017: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/11/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7/17/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Declaration - Verified

8/7/2017: Declaration - Verified

Proof of Publication

8/11/2017: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

8/17/2017: Minute Order

Letters (Initial) - of Administration w/ Full Authority

8/21/2017: Letters (Initial) - of Administration w/ Full Authority

Order - Probate - Appointing Administrator w/ Full Authority

8/21/2017: Order - Probate - Appointing Administrator w/ Full Authority

Notice - Death

8/29/2017: Notice - Death

Waiver - (No Fee) - of Accounting by Distributee

11/9/2017: Waiver - (No Fee) - of Accounting by Distributee

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

11/9/2017: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Account - Final or Waiver

2/22/2018: Account - Final or Waiver

Notice - Hearing

2/23/2018: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

4/19/2018: Minute Order

Order - Final Distribution

6/1/2018: Order - Final Distribution

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • Order - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • in Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Account - Final or Waiver; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (of Accounting by Distributee ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Inventory & Appraisal (Final ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Notice - Death; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Order - Probate (Appointing Administrator w/ Full Authority ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Letters (Initial) (of Administration w/ Full Authority ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • in Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Declaration (Verified ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary - Attachment 3d ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.