This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 20:36:56 (UTC).

NELSON ROSALES VS NURBAN R. LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 NELSON ROSALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NURBAN R LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1745

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALES NELSON

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CHUNG YOUNG

CHUNG MAIE

LOPEZ NURBAN R.

Cross Defendant and Defendant

LOPEZ NURBAN R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINDLER ALAN F.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PRAGER ERIKA

PARSANJ GINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2024
  • Hearing03/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by NURBAN R. LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NURBAN R. LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by NURBAN R. LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NELSON ROSALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MAIE CHUNG (Cross-Complainant); YOUNG CHUNG (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MAIE CHUNG (Defendant); YOUNG CHUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by MAIE CHUNG (Defendant); YOUNG CHUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by MAIE CHUNG (Defendant); YOUNG CHUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES); Filed by MAIE CHUNG (Defendant); YOUNG CHUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NELSON ROSALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NELSON ROSALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NELSON ROSALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NELSON ROSALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NELSON ROSALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINDLER ALAN F. ESQ.