This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 02:13:22 (UTC).

NELSON MURILLO VS RAMMOHAN SINGH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 NELSON MURILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAMMOHAN SINGH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E. WINDHAM and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4094

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK E. WINDHAM

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURILLO NELSON

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

ROMAIN NATHAN CHRISTOPHER

STAY GREEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SINGH RAMMOHAN

DOE JOHN

POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC

PEGUES TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHENKMAN MARK

Defendant Attorney

PASAROW STEPHEN CHARLES

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEVINE STEVEN DONALD

ARMSTRONG ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FSC & DISCOVERY & MOTION CUT-OFF DATES ON STIPULATION OF PARTIES

5/10/2023: Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FSC & DISCOVERY & MOTION CUT-OFF DATES ON STIPULATION OF PARTIES

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION (MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, FILED IN RELATED CASE NO. 19STCV29717)

2/14/2023: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION (MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, FILED IN RELATED CASE NO. 19STCV29717)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

11/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE;)

9/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE;)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

9/7/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Notice of Related Case

8/18/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

8/18/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/18/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/12/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10/12/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

10/12/2021: Answer

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

9/7/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2024
  • Hearing04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date FSC & Discovery & Motion Cut-Off Dates on Stipulation of Parties; Filed by: Stay Green, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Continue Trial FSC & Discovery & Motion Cut-Off Dates on Stipulation of Parties scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (Motion to Consolidate, filed in related case No. 19STCV29717); Filed by: Rammohan Singh (Defendant); Postal Delivery Systems, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 29 - Hon. Serena R. Murillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV04497, 20STCV22376, 21STCV19029, 19STCV29717, 21STCV14094 are related; case number 19STCV29717 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nelson Murillo (Plaintiff); As to: Rammohan Singh (Defendant); Nathan Christopher Romain (Defendant); John Doe (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nelson Murillo (Plaintiff); As to: Rammohan Singh (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nelson Murillo (Plaintiff); As to: Rammohan Singh (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less