This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 21:03:53 (UTC).

NELLIE FERRERIA VS PUBLIC STORAGE INC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 NELLIE FERRERIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against PUBLIC STORAGE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9744

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FERRERIA NELLIE

Defendants and Respondents

PUBLIC STORAGE INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VERLATO APRIL A. ESQ.

VERLATO APRIL A ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WOOD CARY L. ESQ

WOOD CARY LINN ESQ

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ...) OF 12/16/2019

12/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ...) OF 12/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ...)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. DUNKIN

10/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. DUNKIN

Separate Statement

10/2/2019: Separate Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/2/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/2/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/1/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/27/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

3/29/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/29/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nellie Ferreria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication, Filed by the Defendant) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication, Filed by the Defendant) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Or In The ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Or In The ...) of 12/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service re: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication; Filed by Public Storage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment (or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Public Storage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Public Storage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Craig L. Dunkin in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication); Filed by Public Storage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Public Storage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Public Storage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nellie Ferreria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nellie Ferreria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699744    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 2

Ferreria v. Public Storage, Inc. 

Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication by Defendant Public Storage is CONTINUED to 12/23/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 2.

The copy of the Lease/ Rental Agreement attached to the declaration of Craig L. Dunkin and on which this motion is based is illegible.  The legibility of the agreement is directly relevant to this motion.  The Court will provide Defendant with an opportunity to supplement the record with a legible copy of the agreement, if one exists.  Defendant must provide a supplemental declaration with a legible copy of the agreement by Wednesday, December 18, 2019.  Any response by Plaintiff must be filed by Friday, December 20, 2019.  Courtesy copies are to be delivered to Department 2. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.