This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 05:29:16 (UTC).

NEIL STEVEN MEYN VS E-GIANT LAX, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 NEIL STEVEN MEYN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against E-GIANT LAX, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7248

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEYN NEIL STEVEN

Defendants

CHE SONG

E-GIANT LAX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAZIF SY

Defendant Attorney

IZURIETA JACQUELINE INEZ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/18/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/8/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/9/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2023
  • Hearing09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Hearing03/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by E-Giant LAX, Inc. (Defendant); Song Che (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by E-Giant LAX, Inc. (Defendant); Song Che (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by E-Giant LAX, Inc. (Defendant); Song Che (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Neil Steven Meyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less