This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2023 at 06:29:49 (UTC).

NEIGHBORHOOD ELECTIONS NOW, ET AL. VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 NEIGHBORHOOD ELECTIONS NOW, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1567

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BACH CHRISTOPHER

BACH EMILY

BACH MICHAEL

NEIGHBORHOOD ELECTIONS NOW

PARK ANN

PARK JAMES

PARK MICHAEL JOONHOO

VANCE KIM

Defendant

CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFFERTY SCOTT ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ALVAREZ-GLASMAN ARNOLD M.

LARSON DALE K

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER AND DISMISSAL

5/19/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER AND DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

5/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

5/10/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/25/2023: Complaint

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MEMO ISO THEREOF

5/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MEMO ISO THEREOF

Request for Judicial Notice

4/11/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/11/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/11/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/11/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

4/11/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Case Management Statement

4/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT

3/30/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO C...)

3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO C...) OF 03/30/2023, STIPULATION RE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

3/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO C...) OF 03/30/2023, STIPULATION RE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/27/2023

2/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/27/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARNOLD M. ALVAREZ-GLASMAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

2/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARNOLD M. ALVAREZ-GLASMAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Order and Dismissal; Filed by: City of Montebello (Defendant); As to: Neighborhood Elections Now (Plaintiff); Kim Vance (Plaintiff); James Park (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: City of Montebello (Defendant); Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend ; Result Date: 05/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Neighborhood Elections Now, et al. on 01/25/2023, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketReply in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by: City of Montebello (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketOpposition Plaintiffs Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint and Memo ISO thereof; Filed by: Neighborhood Elections Now (Plaintiff); Kim Vance (Plaintiff); James Park (Plaintiff); Ann Park (Plaintiff); Michael Joonhoo Park (Plaintiff); Michael Bach (Plaintiff); Emily Bach (Plaintiff); Christopher Bach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff Ex Parte Application for Order to Show C...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEx-parte Hearing on Ex Parte Application temporary restraining order scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to 01/25/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Neighborhood Elections Now (Plaintiff); Kim Vance (Plaintiff); James Park (Plaintiff); Ann Park (Plaintiff); Michael Joonhoo Park (Plaintiff); Michael Bach (Plaintiff); Emily Bach (Plaintiff); Christopher Bach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application temporary restraining order; Filed by: Neighborhood Elections Now (Plaintiff); Kim Vance (Plaintiff); James Park (Plaintiff); Ann Park (Plaintiff); Michael Joonhoo Park (Plaintiff); Michael Bach (Plaintiff); Emily Bach (Plaintiff); Christopher Bach (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less