This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 12:29:39 (UTC).

NEHA JAUHAR VS AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 NEHA JAUHAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4225

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAUHAR NEHA

Defendants

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC.

RICHARDSON SYDNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUTHERS SASHA ALEXIS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Neha Jauhar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Neha Jauhar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Neha Jauhar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Neha Jauhar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRUTHERS SASHA