This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 22:40:19 (UTC).

NEGRILLO, LADY BERNADETTE ARTIL VS NEGRILLO, RONALD

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 NEGRILLO, LADY BERNADETTE ARTIL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NEGRILLO, RONALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L and SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1421

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEGRILLO LADY BERNADETTE ARTIL

Respondent

NEGRILLO RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P

Respondent Attorney

PAYNE SHANNON

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

7/26/2019: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/26/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/26/2019: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

7/26/2019: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Notice - Case Assignment

7/26/2019: Notice - Case Assignment

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

7/26/2019: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

Declaration - Income and Expense

7/26/2019: Declaration - Income and Expense

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

7/26/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Attend Mediation

7/26/2019: Order - Attend Mediation

Summons

7/26/2019: Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/26/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Mail - Response And Request for Dissolution Of Marriage, UCCJEA

9/12/2019: Proof of Service - Mail - Response And Request for Dissolution Of Marriage, UCCJEA

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/12/2019: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/12/2019: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

9/20/2019: Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/20/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/20/2019: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/20/2019: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Without Prejudice; Entire Action ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F46, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Denied - Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Rejected 11-6-19 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F46, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - Order; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketOrder - Attend Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less