This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 07:39:06 (UTC).

NECHEMIA BARAZANI VS JOSE ISABEL GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 NECHEMIA BARAZANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ISABEL GARCIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8045

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARAZANI NECHEMIA

Defendants

GARCIA JOSE ISABEL

PEREZ DISPOSAL CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUFF JEANY

Defendant Attorneys

RUBIN G DAVID

BUGARIN ROSA M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/15/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12/9/2021: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/29/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

1/9/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2024
  • Hearing10/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2023
  • Hearing10/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2023
  • Hearing10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER; Filed by: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant); As to: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant); As to: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/27/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant); As to: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff); As to: Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/19/2021; Service Cost: 153.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nechemia Barazani (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Isabel Garcia (Defendant); Perez Disposal Co. Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUGARIN ROSA M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN G. DAVID