This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 22:14:56 (UTC).

NAZAR MANSOUR VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 NAZAR MANSOUR filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, TERRY GREEN, CAROLYN B. KUHL and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0959

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

TERRY GREEN

CAROLYN B. KUHL

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANSOUR NAZAR

MANSOUR NADIA

Defendants

3M COMPANY

BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC.

B C STOCKING DISTRIBUTING

BG PRODUCTS INCORPORATED

BALKAMP INC.

CHEVRON CORPORATION

PETRO SOURCE INVESTMENTS INC. FKA PETRO SOURCE REFINING CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

WD-40 COMPANY

WURTH USA INC.

POR - 15 INC.

KANO LABORATORIES INC.

SAFETY-KLEEN SYSTEMS INC.

CRC INDUSTRIES INC. DBA PENNSYLVANIA CRC INDUSTRIES INC. A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

O' REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC.

SPECTRUM LUBRICANTS CORP.

UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

KERN OIL & REFINING CO.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METZGER RAPHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

CORLESS THOMAS CONDIE

FOLEY PATRICK J.

FRIEDENBERG ADAM DAVID

GALLAGHER MICHAEL EDGAR JR

MUENCH RICHARD ARTHUR

REINHOLTZ JACK R.

SULLIVAN KAREN M.

WARREN STEFANIE

WHELAN KEVIN E.

YANG REY S.

KANNETT MARK S.

TOBIN THOMAS JOHN

POND FRANCIS DENNIS

ALMAZAN MARLA TALINA

HURRELL THOMAS CHARLES

HUTCHINSON THOMAS HENRY

KATZ DEIDRE COHEN

KUM ROBERT

LEVIN JASON

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELISSA ROSE BADGETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WURTH USA, INC.'S APPLICATION

9/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELISSA ROSE BADGETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WURTH USA, INC.'S APPLICATION

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

9/17/2021: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order - ORDER GRANTING DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

9/20/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER GRANTING AMGRO INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

9/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER GRANTING AMGRO INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Order - ORDER GRANTING KANO LABORATORIES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

9/10/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING KANO LABORATORIES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/7/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT RUST-OLEUM CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/30/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT RUST-OLEUM CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/1/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Other - - REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM SERVICE LIST BY DEFENDANT PORTER MANUFACTURING & SUPPLY COMPANY, LLC

9/1/2021: Other - - REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM SERVICE LIST BY DEFENDANT PORTER MANUFACTURING & SUPPLY COMPANY, LLC

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

8/25/2021: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Notice - DEFENDANT AMGRO INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

8/25/2021: Notice - DEFENDANT AMGRO INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

8/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/24/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

8/4/2021: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Request for Dismissal

8/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

229 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Rust-Oleum Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Granting Amgro Investments Limited Partnership's Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by Amgro Investments Limited Parnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Melissa Rose Badgett in Support of Defendant Wurth USA, Inc.'s Application); Filed by Wurth USA Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by Wurth USA Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Kano Laboratories, Inc.'s Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by Kano Laboratories, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
250 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff); Nadia Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketPlaintiffs' Initial Statement of Damages; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nazar Mansour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BALKAMP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PETRO SOURCE INVESTMENTS INC. FKA PETRO SOURCE REFINING CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KANO LABORATORIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BG PRODUCTS INCORPORATED is a litigant