Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 04:31:24 (UTC).

NAZANIN HOSSEINIAN, ET AL. VS IRAJ SHIRAZI

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 NAZANIN HOSSEINIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IRAJ SHIRAZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0509

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NADERY GOLAK

HOSSEINIAN NAZANIN

Defendant

SHIRAZI IRAJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYA BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

PEMSTEIN JASON M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

8/30/2019: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

9/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 09/09/2019

9/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 09/09/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/1/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Demand for Jury Trial

6/12/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/12/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/9/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/10/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of 09/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketBrief (Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement); Filed by Iraj Shirazi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff); Golak Nadery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Iraj Shirazi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Iraj Shirazi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Iraj Shirazi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Iraj Shirazi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff); Golak Nadery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff); Golak Nadery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff); Golak Nadery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff); Golak Nadery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nazanin Hosseinian (Plaintiff); Golak Nadery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEMSTEIN JASON MICHAEL ESQ.