Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 00:05:55 (UTC).

NAWID WADOOD ET AL VS JEEHYE BERGLUND

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 NAWID WADOOD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEEHYE BERGLUND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2766

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALSHAKSHIR NADIA

WADOOD NAWID

Defendants and Respondents

BERGLUND JEEHYE

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WELCH RANCE D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG EL MAHDI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/30/2019: Minute Order

Demand for Jury Trial

2/27/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/27/2019: Answer

SUMMONS

8/16/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Answer; Filed by JEEHYE BERGLUND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by JEEHYE BERGLUND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by NAWID WADOOD (Plaintiff); NADIA ALSHAKSHIR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC672766    Hearing Date: August 11, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

nawid wadood, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

jeehye berglund,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC672766

Hearing Date: September 2, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

NOTICE

Department #32 will be dark for motions on August 11, 2020.  The parties are ordered to email the Court’s clerk at SSCDept32@lacourt.org to inform the clerk whether they are submitting on the Court’s tentative or whether they are requesting a hearing.  If any party requests a hearing, one will be scheduled.  If the parties do not email the Court’s clerk before the hearing time to request a hearing, they will waive the right to be heard and shall submit to this tentative order, which shall issue.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant Jeehye Berglund (“Defendant”) moves to compel responses from Plaintiff Nadia Slshakshir (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One (“FROG”); and (3) Special Interrogatories, Set One (“SROG”). Defendant served the written discovery on Plaintiff by mail on February 27, 2019. Plaintiff’s responses were thus due by April 3, 2019. As of the filing date of these motions, Defendant has not received responses from Plaintiff. Plaintiff has not opposed the motions, and there is nothing in the record suggesting that she has complied with her discovery obligations. Accordingly, the motions to compel responses to the RPD, FROG, and SROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300.

Defendant seeks sanctions against Plaintiff (but not Plaintiff’s counsel) totaling $930 in connection with the motions. The Court concludes that Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. The Court finds that this amount is fair and reasonable under the circumstances. Therefore, the request for sanctions is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the RPD, FROG, and SROG are granted per

Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff (but not Plaintiff’s counsel) is ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $930 to Defendant, by and through counsel, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Defendant is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: August 11, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG EL MAHDI