Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 00:15:57 (UTC).

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS EDWARD F. SMITH

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION against EDWARD F SMITH in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6093

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SMITH EDWARD F.

 

Court Documents

Declaration

8/15/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

8/20/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

4/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Settlement

4/4/2019: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons

11/26/2018: Summons

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Declaration

11/26/2018: Declaration

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketResponse for Order to Show Cause; Filed by Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement) of 05/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) of 04/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (regarding venue); Filed by Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less