This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 18:27:57 (UTC).

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP. VS VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 NAVITAS CREDIT CORP filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS, LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0383

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP.

Defendants

LANGENDOEN GARY

MADISON REALTY EQUITIES LLC

VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNS BARRY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

9/19/2022: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [JUDGMENT]

9/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [JUDGMENT]

Judgment

9/20/2022: Judgment

Judgment

9/20/2022: Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

9/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Judgment

9/19/2022: Judgment

Judgment

9/19/2022: Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

12/14/2022: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/14/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ - Return

2/14/2023: Writ - Return

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Filed By: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed ; Result Date: 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketWrit - Return ( ); Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Service Date: 10/12/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Service Date: 10/12/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant) to Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant) to Gary Langendoen (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant) to Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant) to Gary Langendoen (Defendant), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Navitas Credit Corp. against Defendant Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP, Defendant Gary Langendoen and Defendant Madison Realty Equities, LLC on the Petition filed by Navitas Credit Corp. on 09/19/2022 for the principal amount of $32,722.00, interest of $394.24, and other $435.00 for a total of $33,551.24.Other: Sister- State Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Status Date changed from 09/19/2022 to 09/20/2022; As To Parties changed from Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant), Gary Langendoen (Defendant) to Gary Langendoen (Defendant), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant), Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration re Accrued Interest; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Issued and Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); Gary Langendoen (Defendant); Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less