This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 15:26:07 (UTC).

NAVARRO, SONYA M VS HEIDER, KIMBERLY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 NAVARRO, SONYA M filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against HEIDER, KIMBERLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MORDETZKY, MARILYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MORDETZKY, MARILYN

 

Party Details

Respondents and Petitioners

NAVARRO SONYA M

HEIDER KIMBERLY

Respondent and Appellant

HEIDER KIMBERLY

Not Classified By Court

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC.

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Appellant Attorney

SEEMEN BART ALAN

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - ..

6/23/2021: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - ..

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - for NOA 04/09/21

5/14/2021: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - for NOA 04/09/21

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - For NOA 04/09/21

5/14/2021: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - For NOA 04/09/21

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

4/23/2021: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - General Appeal

4/9/2021: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - General Appeal

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/29/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service

1/29/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/10/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/29/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/4/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/4/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/4/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/4/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

1/4/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/4/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/4/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Miscellaneous - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

1/4/2021: Miscellaneous - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

Response - Civil Harassment

1/19/2021: Response - Civil Harassment

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1-5 Volumes Certified (1 VOL; 29 PAGES; 1 ORG; 1 CC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (APPELLANT PAID $18.76 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (.. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (for NOA 04/09/21 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Superior Court Appeal Filing Fee Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed (General Appeal ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEEMEN BART