This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 10:42:11 (UTC).

NATIXIS WEALTH MANAGEMENT VS CHRISTIAN QUEROU

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 NATIXIS WEALTH MANAGEMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CHRISTIAN QUEROU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO, JON R. TAKASUGI, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5325

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

JON R. TAKASUGI

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NATIXIS WEALTH MANAGEMENT

Defendant and Respondent

QUEROU CHRISTIAN

Not Classified By Court

POSSIDONI JEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MOLINSKI WILLIAM A. ESQ.

SLATES RONALD P.

MOLINSKI WILLIAM ALAN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ALTMAN BRYAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICE PURSU...)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICE PURSU...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

4/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

2/4/2021: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

2/4/2021: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order -

8/10/2018: Minute Order -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/21/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

10/3/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

Substitution of Attorney -

10/4/2018: Substitution of Attorney -

Answer -

10/4/2018: Answer -

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - Declaration Of Frederic Lalance In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment

11/1/2018: Declaration - Declaration Of Frederic Lalance In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

11/1/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Reply - Reply TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/11/2019: Reply - Reply TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Case Management Confe...)

1/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Case Management Confe...)

Notice - Notice OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/23/2019: Notice - Notice OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

4/17/2018: Minute Order -

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Bankruptcy as to Christian Querou and Jeanne Possidoni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (as to Herve Caen, an Individual) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (as to HERVE CAEN - SECRETARY OF Z-PASTA BAR 2 INC.) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (as to Herve Caen) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (as to Herve Caen PMK of Company Pasta Inc.) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) (NOTICE OF FILING CHAPTER 7 PETITION BY CHRISTIAN QUEROU AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY); Filed by Christian Querou (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (as to Z-Pasta Bar 2) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (as to Company Pasta) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketLALANCE DECLARATION ISO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketBENSINGER DECL. ISO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION SEEKING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Natixis Wealth Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DOMESTICATION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Natixis Wealth Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

D Pe Pred < ) 2 e

O &0 3 O wn =

.. CHRISTIAN QUEROU,

' FILED

WILLIAM A. MOLINSKI (STATE BAR NO. 145186) rlor Court of California wmolinski@orrick.com ountv.of Los Annéles - DYLAN M. BENSINGER (STATE BAR NO. 318107) FE% a'2 8 2018 dbensinger@orrick.com ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFELLP . - SherrlR. ¢ gcutive Officer/Clerk 777 South Figueroa Street By Deputy

Suite 3200 S den Los Angeles, CA 90017-5855 . Telephone: +1-213-629-2020

~Facsimile: +1-213-612-2499

RONALD P. SLATES (STATE BAR NO. 43712) rslates2@rslateslaw.com

THE LAW OFFICES OF RONALD P. SLATES, P. C. 500 South Grand Avenue

Suite 2010

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Telephone: +1-213-624-1515

Facsimile: +1-213-624-7536

Attorneys for Plaintiff

NATIXIS WEALTH MANAGEMENT SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

. -~ ™= BC695329 NATIXIS WEALTH MANAGEMENT, CASE NO. Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR DOMESTICATION

AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN

V. JUDGMENT

SRR o -

Defendant.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOLINSKI, WILLIAM A.