This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 09:49:21 (UTC).

NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE ET AL VS NATHAN ROMERO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATHAN ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2923

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOZADA-ESCORZA BENITA

BUSTAMANTE NATIVIDAD

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

ROMERO NATHAN

ROMERO FRANK

DOES 1 TO 50

Cross Defendants

1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE ROES

HART ADRIANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YAGOUBZADEH JOSHUA ESQ.

YAGHOUBZADEH JOSHUA E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JON E. HELLESEN ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HELLESEN JON E. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

NEILL BRIAN PATRICK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/18/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/28/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial

1/18/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/18/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/18/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/18/2019: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

5/16/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

5/16/2019: Ex Parte Application

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/16/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2018: Proof of Personal Service

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/8/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 631

8/8/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 631

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/18/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/18/2017: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Dates); Filed by NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE (Plaintiff); BENITA LOZADA-ESCORZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Joshua E. Yaghoubzadeh, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Answer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Adrianna Hart (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Adrianna Hart (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Adrianna Hart (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Answer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Adrianna Hart (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE (Plaintiff); BENITA LOZADA-ESCORZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE (Plaintiff); BENITA LOZADA-ESCORZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice; Filed by NATIVIDAD BUSTAMANTE (Plaintiff); BENITA LOZADA-ESCORZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC672923    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 2

Bustamante, et al. v. Romero, et al.

The Court GRANTS the motion for a continuance of the final status conference, trial and all related dates.  The Court sets the following dates:

Final status conference:  June 24, 2020

Trial: July 6, 2020

The discovery and motion cut-offs and other related dates are to be calculated based on the new trial date.

The parties must treat these dates as firm.  The parties should not expect the Court to grant any further continuances.