This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2020 at 15:38:52 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE CONSULTING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS GABY'S PHD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 NATIONWIDE CONSULTING, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GABY'S PHD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7471

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

NATIONWIDE CONSULTING INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MAALOUF GABY K

GABY'S PHD A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEVITT SCOTT L.

LEVITT SCOTT

LEVITT SCOTT LAMONT

Defendant Attorneys

SHABY DAVID MICHAEL

HARSHMAN RYAN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/09/2020

11/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

12/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

11/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/24/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/24/2020: Cross-Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT LEVITT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

8/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT LEVITT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/20/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/7/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GABY'S PHD, a California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Gaby K Maalouf (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 11/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GABY'S PHD, a California corporation (Defendant); Gaby K Maalouf (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Scott Levitt in support of Demurrer); Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GABY'S PHD, a California corporation (Defendant); Gaby K Maalouf (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by GABY'S PHD, a California corporation (Defendant); Gaby K Maalouf (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nationwide Consulting, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVITT SCOTT L. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEAVITT SCOTT