This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 06:29:43 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS DOMINIC YOUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DOMINIC YOUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0059

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR. COOPER

Defendants

YOUNG DOMINIC

YOUNG LAUREEN BIANCA

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE HEIRS OF LAUREEN YOUNG JR DECEASED AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

YOUNG DAMAJA JUWAN AKA DJ YOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TREDER EDWARD ALAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

5/14/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TREDER, EDWARD A