Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2018 at 22:51:39 (UTC).

NATIONAL FUNDING INC VS JS CONSTRUCTION & REMODELING LLC ET

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 NATIONAL FUNDING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JS CONSTRUCTION REMODELING LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RITA MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5829

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RITA MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NATIONAL FUNDING INC.

Defendants and Respondents

JS CONSTRUCTION & REMODELING LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

STEWART JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALISIAN NEAL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/2/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/2/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/2/2017: DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

10/2/2017: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Proof of Service

10/2/2017: Proof of Service

DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/2/2017: DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST TO GRANT ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF COURT 3.214

10/2/2017: REQUEST TO GRANT ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF COURT 3.214

DECLARATION AND ORDER PERMITTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS IN PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/2/2017: DECLARATION AND ORDER PERMITTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS IN PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT/COURT AFT DEFAULT

10/2/2017: JUDGMENT/COURT AFT DEFAULT

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LOAN AGREEMENT; AND ETC

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LOAN AGREEMENT; AND ETC

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/1/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

6/29/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

7/17/2017: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER PERMITTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS IN PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • REQUEST TO GRANT ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF COURT 3.214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by National Funding, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LOAN AGREEMENT; AND ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALISIAN NEAL S. ESQ.