This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2022 at 02:18:05 (UTC).

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 9825 ALEXANDER AVENUE, SOUTH GATE, CA 90280

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 9825 ALEXANDER AVENUE, SOUTH GATE, CA 90280. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0258

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Claimant

FERNANDEZ ERALIA ERALIA E. FERNANDEZ

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 9825 ALEXANDER AVENUE SOUTH GATE CA 90280

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MIKA BRANDON

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

6/27/2022: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Response - RESPONSE CLAIM OF ERALIA FERNANDEZ FOR SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE; JOINDER AND AFFIRMATION

7/5/2022: Response - RESPONSE CLAIM OF ERALIA FERNANDEZ FOR SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE; JOINDER AND AFFIRMATION

Proof of Service by Mail

7/1/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketResponse (CLAIM OF ERALIA FERNANDEZ FOR SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE; JOINDER AND AFFIRMATION); Filed by Eralia Fernandez (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON