This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2020 at 16:03:49 (UTC).

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1741 GRANVILLE AVE, UNIT 101, LOS ANGELES, C

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1741 GRANVILLE AVE, UNIT 101, LOS ANGELES, C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1741 GRANVILLE AVE UNIT 101 LOS ANGELES CA 90025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZAHRADKA ROBERT PAUL

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE

10/1/2020: Order - ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE

Notice of Ruling

10/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAI...)

10/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAI...)

Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/12/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/23/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Proof of Service by Mail

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/25/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/25/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

2/18/2020: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Petition (and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketOrder (granting petition to deposit undistributed surplus proceeds of trustee's sale); Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Petition (and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (to DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 2924j(c) & (d)); Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20SMCP00088    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: M

The Court tentatively grants National Default Servicing Corporations' Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale.  The Court further intends to sign the proposed order granting the motion.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAHRADKA ROBERT